District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0506 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/03/2023

                    ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
1 
 
 
 
AN ACT 
 
__________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
____________________ 
 
To amend, on emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Homeless Services Reform Act 
of 2005 to establish grounds for an extension to the Family Re-Housing Stabilization 
Program, whereby the Department of Human Services, or its designee, will thoroughly 
consider the totality of the participant's circumstances, including their progress and 
eligibility for affordable housing. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Family Re-Housing Stabilization Program Protection Congressional 
Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”.  
 
Sec. 2. Section 7(b)(4)(B) of the Homeless Services Reform Act of 2005, effective 
October 22, 2005 (D.C. Law 16-35; D.C. Official Code § 4–753.01(b)(4)(B)), is amended as 
follows:  
(a) The existing text is designated as sub-subparagraph (i).  
(b) New sub-subparagraphs (ii) and (iii) are added to read as follows:  
“(ii) The Department, or the Department’s designee, shall consider 
requests for Family Re-Housing Stabilization Program (“FRSP”) assistance extending past 12 
months if:   
“(I) There is funding available within FRSP;  
“(II) The participant has requested an extension in writing;  
“(III) The participant has made a good faith effort towards 
the achievement of goals set forth in an individualized plan with the aim of a targeted 
progression towards exit from the supports of FRSP, as observed by the service provider at 
consistent intervals, but cannot yet sustain housing stability independently of FRSP; and   
 “(IV) The participant has not yet been approved for 
permanently affordable housing. 
 “(iii) When making a determination of whether to grant a 
participant in FRSP an extension beyond 12 months, the Department or Department's designee 
shall:  
“(I) Consider the totality of the circumstances; and   ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
2 
“(II) Grant extensions of time in increments not greater 
than 6 months, with regular formal reviews every 3 months to ensure that participants are given 
the support necessary to exit FRSP with stable housing.” 
 “(iv) If a requested extension of FRSP assistance by a participant is 
denied, the participant shall be given 30 days written notice prior to the final subsidy payment 
explicitly setting forth the reason for the denial of additional assistance and inform the 
participant that the FRSP participant has a right to: 
“(I) Appeal the determination through a fair hearing and 
administrative review, including deadlines for requesting an appeal; and 
“(II) The continuation of FRSP services pending the 
outcome of any fair hearing requested within 15 days of receipt of written notice of a 
termination.”. 
 
Sec. 3. Applicability 
This act shall apply as of July 31, 2023. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.   
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia 
 
  ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
3