7 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | ____________________ |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To amend, on a temporary basis, the District of Columbia Workers’ Compensation Act of 1979 |
---|
17 | | - | to provide that the payment or award of compensation under the workers’ compensation |
---|
18 | | - | law of any other state shall not bar a claim for compensation under the District’s workers’ |
---|
19 | | - | compensation law for the same injury or death; provided, that any such award under the |
---|
20 | | - | District’s workers’ compensation law shall be reduced by the amount of compensation |
---|
21 | | - | received or awarded under the workers’ compensation law of any other state. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
24 | | - | act may be cited as the “Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Temporary Amendment Act |
---|
25 | | - | of 2023”. |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 4(a-1) of the District of Columbia Workers’ Compensation Act of 1979, |
---|
28 | | - | effective July 1, 1980 (D.C. Law 3-77; D.C. Official Code § 32-1503(a-1)), is amended to read |
---|
29 | | - | as follows: |
---|
30 | | - | “(a-1)(1) Notwithstanding any other law, the payment or award of compensation under |
---|
31 | | - | the workers’ compensation law of any other state to an employee or his dependent shall not bar a |
---|
32 | | - | claim for compensation under this act for the same injury or death; provided, that any such award |
---|
33 | | - | of compensation under this act shall be reduced by the amount of compensation received or |
---|
34 | | - | awarded under the workers’ compensation law of any other state. |
---|
35 | | - | “(2) This subsection shall apply to all claims under this act that are pending as of |
---|
36 | | - | June 28, 2022, and all claims under this act filed after June 28, 2022.”. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 3. Applicability. |
---|
39 | | - | This act shall apply as of May 4, 2023. |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
42 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal |
---|
43 | | - | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, |
---|
44 | | - | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 7 | + | A BILL 1 |
---|
| 8 | + | 2 |
---|
| 9 | + | 25-512 3 |
---|
| 10 | + | 4 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 |
---|
| 12 | + | 6 |
---|
| 13 | + | ______________________ 7 |
---|
| 14 | + | 8 |
---|
| 15 | + | 9 |
---|
| 16 | + | To amend, on a temporary basis, the District of Columbia Workers’ Compensation Act of 1979 10 |
---|
| 17 | + | to provide that the payment or award of compensation under the workers’ compensation 11 |
---|
| 18 | + | law of any other state shall not bar a claim for compensation under the District’s workers’ 12 |
---|
| 19 | + | compensation law for the same injury or death; provided, that any such award under the 13 |
---|
| 20 | + | District’s workers’ compensation law shall be reduced by the amount of compensation 14 |
---|
| 21 | + | received or awarded under the workers’ compensation law of any other state. 15 |
---|
| 22 | + | 16 |
---|
| 23 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 17 |
---|
| 24 | + | act may be cited as the “Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Temporary Amendment Act 18 |
---|
| 25 | + | of 2023”. 19 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. Section 4(a-1) of the District of Columbia Workers’ Compensation Act of 1979, 20 |
---|
| 27 | + | effective July 1, 1980 (D.C. Law 3-77; D.C. Official Code § 32-1503(a-1)), is amended to read 21 |
---|
| 28 | + | as follows: 22 |
---|
| 29 | + | “(a-1)(1) Notwithstanding any other law, the payment or award of compensation under 23 |
---|
| 30 | + | the workers’ compensation law of any other state to an employee or his dependent shall not bar a 24 |
---|
| 31 | + | claim for compensation under this act for the same injury or death; provided, that any such award 25 |
---|
| 32 | + | of compensation under this act shall be reduced by the amount of compensation received or 26 |
---|
| 33 | + | awarded under the workers’ compensation law of any other state. 27 |
---|
| 34 | + | “(2) This subsection shall apply to all claims under this act that are pending as of 28 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL |
---|
52 | | - | Sec. 5. Effective date. |
---|
53 | | - | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by |
---|
54 | | - | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review |
---|
55 | | - | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December |
---|
56 | | - | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of |
---|
57 | | - | Columbia Register. |
---|
58 | | - | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. |
---|
59 | | - | |
---|
60 | | - | |
---|
61 | | - | |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Chairman |
---|
64 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | |
---|
68 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Mayor |
---|
70 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
71 | | - | |
---|
72 | | - | |
---|
| 40 | + | the effective date of the Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Emergency Amendment Act 29 |
---|
| 41 | + | of 2022, as introduced on June 6, 2022 (Bill 24-841), and all claims under this act filed after the 30 |
---|
| 42 | + | effective date of the Parity in Workers’ Compensation Recovery Emergency Amendment Act of 31 |
---|
| 43 | + | 2022, as introduced on June 6, 2022 (Bill 24-841).”. 32 |
---|
| 44 | + | Sec. 3. Applicability. 33 |
---|
| 45 | + | This act shall apply as of May 4, 2023. 34 |
---|
| 46 | + | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 35 |
---|
| 47 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 36 |
---|
| 48 | + | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 37 |
---|
| 49 | + | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 38 |
---|
| 50 | + | Sec. 5. Effective date. 39 |
---|
| 51 | + | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 40 |
---|
| 52 | + | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 41 |
---|
| 53 | + | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 42 |
---|
| 54 | + | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 43 |
---|
| 55 | + | Columbia Register. 44 |
---|
| 56 | + | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect 45 |
---|