District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0527 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
61 1
7-AN ACT
8-
9-_________________
10-
11-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-____________________________
14-
15-
16-To amend, on an emergency basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of
17-Columbia Establishment Act of 2011 to clarify the requirement that the CJCC report
18-aggregate programmatic data on process and outcomes of programs.
19-
20- BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
21-act may be cited as the “CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Emergency Amendment
22-Act of 2023”.
23-
24-Sec. 2. Section 1501 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of
25-Columbia Establishment Act of 2011, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official
26-Code § 22-4234), is amended by adding new subsections (b-5) and (b-6) to read as follows:
27-“(b-5)(1) By December 1, 2023, and on a quarterly basis thereafter, the CJCC shall
28-submit to the Mayor and the Council and post on its website a report that includes in accordance
29-with existing law aggregate data on the following with respect to the criminal justice and
30-juvenile justice systems:
31- “(A) Diversion;
32- “(B) Pretrial supervision;
33- “(C) Detention;
34- “(D) Prosecution;
35- “(E) Sentencing;
36- “(F) Commitment;
37- “(G) Incarceration;
38- “(H) Probation;
39- “(I) Parole,
40- “(J) Supervised release; and
41- “(K) Deferred prosecution agreements, deferred sentencing
42-agreements, deferred disposition agreements, and consent decrees.
43- “(2) The CJCC shall include in the report information and context to aid the
44-general public in interpretation of the data.
45-“(3) Prior to submitting and posting the aggregate data, the CJCC shall provide
46-each agency that supplies data at least one week to review and comment on the data presentation ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
51- 2
52-and any analysis relevant to the agency. The CJCC shall review the feedback provided by the
53-agencies and determine, in its sole discretion, whether to revise the presentation and analysis
54-accordingly.
55-“(b-6) The CJCC shall post the following year-to-date data on its website monthly,
56-beginning with the earliest year for which CJCC is able to obtain historical data:
57- “(1) Arrests for violent crimes committed by juveniles and adults, by offense; and
58- “(2) Gun violence and homicide counts and rates citywide and by ward,
59-neighborhood, and police service area.”.
60-
61-Sec. 3. Section 5 of the Prioritizing Public Safety Temporary Amendment Act of 2023,
62-passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-396), is repealed.
63-
64-Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.
65-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
66-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
67-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
68-
69-Sec. 5. Effective date.
70-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
71-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
72-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
73-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
74-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
75-
76-
77-______________________________
78-Chairman
79-Council of the District of Columbia
80-
81-
82-
83-
84-
85-_________________________________
86-Mayor
87-District of Columbia
88-
2+ _________________________ 1
3+ Councilmember Brooke Pinto 2
4+ 3
5+ 4
6+A BILL 5
7+ 6
8+_________________ 7
9+ 8
10+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9
11+ 10
12+______________ 11
13+ 12
14+To amend, on an emergency basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 13
15+Columbia Establishment Act of 2011 to clarify the requirement that the CJCC report 14
16+aggregate programmatic data on process and outcomes of programs. 15
17+ 16
18+ BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this 17
19+act may be cited as the “CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Emergency Amendment 18
20+Act of 2023”. 19
21+Sec. 2. Section 1501 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 20
22+Columbia Establishment Act of 2011, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 21
23+Code § 22-4234), is amended by adding new subsections (b-5) and (b-6) to read as follows: 22
24+“(b-5)(1) By December 1, 2023, and on a quarterly basis thereafter, the CJCC shall 23
25+submit to the Mayor and the Council and post on its website a report that includes the following 24
26+information, in accordance with existing law: Aggregate data on the following with respect to the 25
27+criminal justice and juvenile justice systems: diversion, pretrial supervision, detention, 26
28+prosecution, sentencing, commitment, incarceration, probation, parole, supervised release, 27
29+deferred prosecution agreements, deferred sentencing agreements, deferred disposition 28
30+agreements, and consent decrees. 29
31+ “(2) The CJCC shall include in the report information and context to aid the 30
32+general public in interpretation of the data. 31 2
33+“(3) Prior to submitting and posting aggregate data, the CJCC shall provide each 32
34+agency that supplies data at least one week to review and comment on the data presentation and 33
35+any analysis relevant to the agency. The CJCC shall review the feedback provided by agencies 34
36+and determine, in its sole discretion, whether to revise the presentation and analysis accordingly. 35
37+“(b-6) The CJCC shall post the following year-to-date data on its website monthly, 36
38+beginning with the earliest year for which CJCC is able to obtain historical data: 37
39+ “(1) Arrests for violent crimes committed by juveniles and adults, by offense; and 38
40+ “(2) Gun violence and homicide counts and rates citywide and by ward, 39
41+neighborhood, and police service area.”. 40
42+Sec. 3. Section 5 of the Prioritizing Public Safety Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, 41
43+passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-396), is repealed. 42
44+Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 43
45+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 44
46+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 45
47+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 46
48+Sec. 5. Effective date. 47
49+This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 48
50+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 49
51+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 50
52+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 51
53+D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 52