Council | 12/01/2023 | Act A25-0321 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015486, Expires on Feb 19, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0321, Expires on Feb 19, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 11/06/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |