Council | 02/16/2024 | Law L25-0120, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001668, Expires on Sep 18, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/22/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 12/15/2023 | Act A25-0326 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015733 | ||
Council | 12/12/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 12/07/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0326 | ||
Council | 11/30/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 14, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0563 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 11/06/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |