Council | 11/26/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/06/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 10/31/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0569 | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 03/18/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/26/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0569 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/08/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |