Council | 11/26/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/12/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | REMOVED FROM AGENDA | ||
Council | 10/15/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/18/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0573 | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 03/13/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/11/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/23/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/16/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/24/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0573 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 11/14/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |