Council | 12/22/2023 | Act A25-0327 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 016075, Expires on Mar 06, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/12/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 12/07/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0327, Expires on Mar 06, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/30/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 14, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Oral Amendment (Pinto) | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Amendment (Pinto) | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Amendment (RWhite); Orally amended by RWhite to February 15, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 11/20/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |