Council | 03/01/2024 | Law L25-0126, Effective from Feb 22, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002079, Expires on Oct 04, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/12/2024 | Act A25-0343 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000645 | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 01/05/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 01/04/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0343 | ||
Council | 12/20/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 5, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/01/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0580 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Amendment (TWhite) | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Amendment (RWhite) | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 11/20/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |