District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0592 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+_______________________________ 1
2+Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2
3+ 3
4+ 4
5+ 5
6+A BILL 6
7+_____ 7
8+ 8
9+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9
10+____________ 10
11+ 11
12+To amend on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Rental Housing Act of 1985 12
13+to maintain a moratorium on voluntary agreements. 13
14+ 14
15+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 15
16+be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency 16
17+Amendment Act of 2023 ”. 17
18+Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6- 10; D.C. 18
19+Official Code § 42- 3501.01 et seq .)), is amended by adding a new section 215a to read as 19
20+follows: 20
21+"Sec. 215a. (a) Notwithstanding the requirements of section 215, tenants and housing 21
22+providers shall not enter into a voluntary agreement pursuant to section 215(a) for 1 year . 22
23+"(b) Subsection (a) of this section shall not affect any voluntary agreements that have 23
24+already been approved by the Rent Administrator pursuant to section 215(b) prior to the 24
25+applicability date of the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020, passed on 25
26+2nd reading December 15, 2020 (enrolled version of Bill 23-878).". 26
27+Sec. 3. Applicability. 27
28+This act shall apply as of October 1, 2023. 28
29+Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 29
30+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 30 2
231
3-
4-
5-
6-1
7-
8-AN ACT
9-
10-__________________
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-____________________
15-
16-
17-To amend on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Rental Housing Act of 1985
18-to maintain a moratorium on voluntary agreements.
19-
20-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may
21-be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency
22-Amendment Act of 2023”.
23-
24-Sec. 2. Section 215a(a) of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective March 16, 2021
25-(D.C. Law 23-246; D.C. Official Code §42-3502.15a(a))), is amended by striking the phrase “2
26-years beginning the applicability date of the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment Act
27-of 2020, passed on 2nd reading December 15, 2020 (enrolled version of Bill 23-878)” and
28-inserting the phrase “one year beginning on October 1, 2023” in its place.
29-
30-Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.
31-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
32-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
33-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
34-
35-Sec. 4. Effective date.
36-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
37-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
38-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
39-
40-
41-
42-
43-
44-
45- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
46-
47-
48-
49-
50-2
51-
52-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
53-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
54-
55-
56-
57-______________________________
58-Chairman
59-Council of the District of Columbia
60-
61-
62-
63-
64-_________________________________
65-Mayor
66-District of Columbia
67-
68-
69-
70-
32+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 31
33+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 32
34+Sec. 5. Effective date. 33
35+This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 34
36+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 35
37+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 36
38+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 37
39+D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). 38
40+ 39
41+ 40