Council | 03/05/2024 | Postponed Indefinitely | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Postponed to March 5, 2024 (McDuffie & Allen) | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Postponed to 2/6/2024 | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Postponed to January 9, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0594 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 12/04/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |