Council | 03/15/2024 | Law L25-0130, Effective from Mar 01, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002682, Expires on Oct 12, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/19/2024 | Act A25-0360 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000859 | ||
Council | 01/18/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 01/11/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 01/10/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0360 | ||
Council | 12/28/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0601 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 12/04/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |