Council | 01/19/2024 | Act A25-0356 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000851, Expires on Apr 09, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/11/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 01/10/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0356, Expires on Apr 09, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/28/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 12/14/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |