District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0643 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/09/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
_________________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________________ 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, and to clarify, on an 
emergency basis, the Department of Small and Local Business Development’s authority 
to issue grants to eligible entrepreneurs and for-profit businesses in Ward 8.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA , That this 
 act may be cited as the “Ward 8 Community Investment Fund Clarification Congressional  
Review Emergency Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) Notwithstanding section 1094 of the Grant Administration Act of 2013, 
effective December 24, 2013 (D.C. Law 20-61; D.C. Official Code § 1-328.13), in Fiscal Year 
2024 and each subsequent fiscal year, the Department of Small and Local Business Development 
shall issue a grant in the amount appropriated for the Ward 8 Community Investment Fund to the 
DC Community Development Consortium Institute to provide grants or microloans to eligible 
entrepreneurs and businesses seeking to establish or sustain for-profit businesses in Ward 8.  
 (b) The following persons and entities shall be eligible to receive grants in the specified 
amounts: 
 (1) Small grants and microloans of up to $5,000 in total to Ward 8 residents for 
costs related to starting a business in Ward 8. Startup costs include business licensing and other 
fees required to incorporate a for-profit business in the District, insurance required by District or 
federal laws or regulations, and pre-operating costs;   
 (2) Grants and microloans not to exceed $10,000 in total to support small 
businesses owned by Ward 8 residents operating in Ward 8 for at least 1 year prior to being 
awarded the grant or microloan; and 
 (3) Grants and microloans not to exceed $20,000 total to support small Ward 8 
businesses owned by Ward 8 residents operating in Ward 8 for at least 3 years prior to being 
awarded the grant or microloan. 
 (c) The DC Community Development Consortium Institute may use up to 20% of the 
total annual grant amount to support operating costs, and to provide technical assistance to, 
eligible applicants and grantees. 
 (d)  The DC Community Development Consortium Institute shall submit a quarterly 
report to the Department of Small and Local Business Development detailing:    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
 (1) The number of applications received; 
 (2) The number of grants issued; 
 (3) The amount of money issued per grant; and 
 (4) A list of entrepreneurs and businesses who were awarded grants in the past 
quarter, a description of the business or business proposal, and a copy of each grant-winning 
application and supporting materials. 
 (e) The DC Community Development Consortium Institute shall 
give Ward 8 residents control over the deployment of capital received from the grant  
through a grant-review committee comprised of 7 Ward 8 residents  
selected annually through an open application process. The DC Community Development  
Consortium Institute shall establish procedures to identify and eliminate conflicts of  
interest with potential recipients through the grant-review committee and provide  
 technical and administrative support to the grant-review committee, as necessary. 
 
 Sec. 3.  Applicability. 
 This act shall apply as of January 24, 2024. 
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1 301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	3 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia