Council | 08/30/2024 | Law L25-0201, Effective from Aug 14, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 010590 | ||
Council | 07/05/2024 | Act A25-0498 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007612 | ||
Council | 07/02/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 06/27/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 06/26/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0498 | ||
Council | 06/20/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 5, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0669 | ||
Council | 03/12/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 02/23/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/14/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/26/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0669 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/23/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 01/12/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |