Council | 06/07/2024 | Law L25-0164, Effective from May 21, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006668, Expires on Jan 01, 2025 | ||
Council | 04/09/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 03/29/2024 | Act A25-0415 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003497 | ||
Council | 03/22/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/21/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0415 | ||
Council | 03/11/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 25, 2024 | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 02/09/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0677 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |