ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 1 A BILL 1 2 25-677 3 4 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 6 __________________ 7 8 9 To amend, on a temporary basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative 10 of 1999 to provide a deadline date by which existing cultivation centers and dispensaries 11 must file their applications with ABCA for additional medical cannabis facility licenses, 12 to not allow a cultivation center to also hold an internet retailer license, 13 to provide that the 2 cultivation center registration applicants that tied for second and 14 received the same total score after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration 15 application to the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between November 29, 2021 and 16 March 28, 2022, be awarded a cultivation center registration, to provide that other 17 cultivation center and dispensary registration applicants that scored 150 points or more 18 after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to the Alcoholic 19 Beverage Control Board during the same open application period shall be considered for 20 a cultivation center or retailer registration, and to allow a cultivation center and 21 dispensary registration applicant that scored 150 points or more to change the location of 22 its facility without otherwise affecting the status of its application. 23 24 25 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 26 act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Supplemental Temporary Amendment 27 Act of 2024”. 28 Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 29 1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 30 amended as follows: 31 (a) Subsection (d) is amended as follows: 32 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 2 (1) Paragraph (2) is amended by striking the phrase “retailer or online retailer 33 license” and inserting the phrase “retailer license” in its place. 34 (2) A new paragraph (5) is added to read as follows: 35 “(5) Applications for additional licenses pursuant to paragraphs (1) through (3) of 36 this subsection shall be filed with ABCA by the existing cultivation center or dispensary by May 37 1, 2024.”. 38 (b) Subsection (e)(1) is amended as follows 39 (1) Subparagraph (F) is amended by striking the phrase “retailer or internet 40 retailer license” and inserting the phrase “retailer license” in its place. 41 (2) A new subparagraph (G) is added to read as follows: 42 “(G) No licensee holding a cultivation center license shall hold an internet 43 retailer license.”. 44 (c) New subsections (w) and (x) are added to read as follows: 45 “(w)(1) The 2 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted a medical cannabis 46 facility registration application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 47 2022, that tied for second and received the same total score shall be awarded a cultivation center 48 registration. 49 “(2) A cultivation center registration applicant not referenced in paragraph (1) of 50 this subsection that scored 150 points or more during the same open application period shall be 51 considered for a cultivation center registration after May 1, 2023; provided, that the applicant 52 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 3 files a corrected application, including an application to change the facility location, with the 53 ABC Board by May 1, 2024. An applicant that scored 150 points or higher shall be allowed to 54 change the location of the cultivation center facility on its application by May 1, 2024, without 55 negatively affecting the status of the application. 56 “(3) An applicant that filed more than one cultivation center registration 57 application during the open application period with one or more of the same owners shall be 58 considered for only one cultivation center registration under this subsection. 59 “(4) An initial application fee paid by a cultivation center registration applicant 60 that scored 150 points or higher shall be credited by ABCA toward the entire cost of the 61 applicant’s cultivation center application fee. 62 “(x)(1) A dispensary registration applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility 63 registration application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, 64 and received 150 points or more shall be considered for a retailer registration no earlier than 180 65 calendar days after March 22, 2023. An applicant shall be allowed to change the location of the 66 retailer facility on its application by May 1, 2024, without negatively affecting the status of the 67 application. 68 “(2) An applicant that filed more than one dispensary registration application 69 during the open application period with one or more of the same owners shall be considered for 70 only one retailer registration under this subsection. 71 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 4 “(3) An initial application fee paid by a dispensary registration applicant that 72 scored 150 points or higher shall be credited by ABCA toward the entire cost of the applicant’s 73 retailer application fee.”. 74 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 75 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 76 statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 77 October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 78 Sec. 4. Effective date. 79 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 80 the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 81 as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 82 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 83 Columbia register. 84 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 85