1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | 1 |
---|
7 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | __________ |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | __________________ |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To approve, on an emergency basis, Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, |
---|
17 | | - | LLC, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6, and to authorize payment for the goods |
---|
18 | | - | and services received and to be received under the contract and modifications. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
21 | | - | act may be cited as the “Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC Approval |
---|
22 | | - | and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the Home Rule Act (D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51) |
---|
25 | | - | and notwithstanding the requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of |
---|
26 | | - | 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council |
---|
27 | | - | approves Contract No. CW103327 with II Kings Carpet Cleaning, LLC, and Modification Nos. |
---|
28 | | - | 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount of $4,500,000 for goods |
---|
29 | | - | and services received from November 1, 2022 through October 31, 2023 and authorizes payment |
---|
30 | | - | in the not-to-exceed amount of $4,395,916 for the goods and services received and to be received |
---|
31 | | - | during the period November 1, 2023 through October 31, 2024. |
---|
32 | | - | |
---|
33 | | - | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
34 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal |
---|
35 | | - | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, |
---|
36 | | - | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
39 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
40 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
41 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in Section |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 1 | + | |
---|