Council | 08/02/2024 | Law L25-0187, Effective from Jul 17, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009560, Expires on Feb 27, 2025 | ||
Council | 04/26/2024 | Act A25-0452 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004651 | ||
Council | 04/19/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 04/17/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/15/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0452 | ||
Council | 04/08/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/08/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0722 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/04/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |