Council | 03/22/2024 | Act A25-0412 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003130, Expires on Jun 11, 2024 | ||
Council | 03/13/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/13/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0412, Expires on Jun 11, 2024 | ||
Council | 03/11/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 25, 2024 | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/04/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |