1 | 1 | | 1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | March 12, 2024 |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | Nyasha Smith, Secretary |
---|
8 | 8 | | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
9 | 9 | | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. |
---|
10 | 10 | | Washington, DC 20004 |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | Dear Secretary Smith, |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | Today, I am introducing the Living Donor Protection Amendment Act of 2024, along with |
---|
15 | 15 | | Councilmembers Janeese Lewis George, Christina Henderson, Charles Allen, Brianne K. |
---|
16 | 16 | | Nadeau, and Matthew Frumin. This legislation would ensure that living organ donors are |
---|
17 | 17 | | protected from unfair insurance discrimination due to their status as a living organ donor. It is |
---|
18 | 18 | | estimated that nearly 200,000 individuals nationwide are living organ donors, and 567 of those |
---|
19 | 19 | | donors are Washingtonians. |
---|
20 | 20 | | 1 |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | According to the American Kidney Fund, states have enacted a patchwork of living organ donor |
---|
24 | 24 | | protections in the absence of a comprehensive federal law. |
---|
25 | 25 | | 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | The two most common state |
---|
27 | 27 | | protections for living organ donors are job-protected leave from public employers and protection |
---|
28 | 28 | | from life, disability or long-term care insurance discrimination. The Organ and Bone Marrow |
---|
29 | 29 | | Donor Leave Amendment Act of 2002 provides District government employees paid leave to |
---|
30 | 30 | | serve as an organ or a bone marrow donor. |
---|
31 | 31 | | 3 |
---|
32 | 32 | | However, unlike 32 other states, the District has yet |
---|
33 | 33 | | to enact a law to protect living organ donors from unfair insurance discrimination. |
---|
34 | 34 | | Based solely on a person’s status as a living organ donor, the Living Donor Protection |
---|
35 | 35 | | Amendment Act of 2024 would prohibit life, disability, and long-term care insurance companies |
---|
36 | 36 | | from: |
---|
37 | 37 | | • Denying, canceling, or refusing to issue coverage; |
---|
38 | 38 | | • Determining the price or premium for coverage; or |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | 1 |
---|
41 | 41 | | Organ Procurement and Transplant Network (OPTN), National and State data, data current as of March 6, 2024. |
---|
42 | 42 | | OPTN data on organ donation dates from 1988, the first full year of OPTN data collection. |
---|
43 | 43 | | 2 |
---|
44 | 44 | | American Kidney Fund, State of the States: 2024 AKF Living Donor Protection Report Card, February 22, 2024. |
---|
45 | 45 | | 3 |
---|
46 | 46 | | D.C. Code § 1–612.03b. 2 |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | • Otherwise varying any term or condition of an insurance policy. |
---|
49 | 49 | | This bill was developed in consultation with the American Kidney Fund, the American Council |
---|
50 | 50 | | of Life Insurers, and the Department of Insurance, Securities, and Banking. |
---|
51 | 51 | | Please contact my Legislative Director, Doni Crawford, at dcrawford@dccouncil.gov if you have |
---|
52 | 52 | | any questions. |
---|
53 | 53 | | |
---|
54 | 54 | | Sincerely, |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | Kenyan R. McDuffie |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | 1 |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | _______________________________ ______________________________ 1 |
---|
63 | 63 | | Councilmember Janeese Lewis George Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 2 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 3 |
---|
65 | 65 | | 4 |
---|
66 | 66 | | ___________________________ ______________________________ 5 |
---|
67 | 67 | | Councilmember Charles Allen Councilmember Christina Henderson 6 |
---|
68 | 68 | | 7 |
---|
69 | 69 | | 8 |
---|
70 | 70 | | ___________________________ ______________________________ 9 |
---|
71 | 71 | | Councilmember Matthew Frumin Councilmember Brianne K. Nadeau 10 |
---|
72 | 72 | | 11 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 12 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 13 |
---|
75 | 75 | | A BILL 14 |
---|
76 | 76 | | 15 |
---|
77 | 77 | | ___________ 16 |
---|
78 | 78 | | 17 |
---|
79 | 79 | | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 18 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 19 |
---|
81 | 81 | | ______________________ 20 |
---|
82 | 82 | | 21 |
---|
83 | 83 | | 22 |
---|
84 | 84 | | To amend the Insurance Trade Economic Development Amendment Act of 2000 to create 23 |
---|
85 | 85 | | definitions for the terms living organ donor and organ, and to protect living organ donors 24 |
---|
86 | 86 | | from unfair discrimination. 25 |
---|
87 | 87 | | 26 |
---|
88 | 88 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 27 |
---|
89 | 89 | | act may be cited as the “Living Donor Protection Amendment Act of 2024”. 28 |
---|
90 | 90 | | Sec. 2. The Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act of 2000, 29 |
---|
91 | 91 | | effective April 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 13-265; D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.01 et seq.), is amended 30 |
---|
92 | 92 | | as follows: 31 |
---|
93 | 93 | | (a) Section 101 (D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.01) is amended as follows: 32 |
---|
94 | 94 | | (1) New paragraphs (7A) and (7B) are added to read as follows: 33 |
---|
95 | 95 | | “(7A) “Living organ donor” means an individual who has donated all or part of an 34 |
---|
96 | 96 | | organ and is not deceased.”. 35 |
---|
97 | 97 | | 2 |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|
99 | 99 | | “(7B) “Organ” means a human eye, kidney, liver, heart, lung, pancreas, 36 |
---|
100 | 100 | | esophagus, stomach, or small or large intestine, a portion of the gastrointestinal tract, or another 37 |
---|
101 | 101 | | part of the human body designated by the Commissioner by rule.”. 38 |
---|
102 | 102 | | (b) Section 111 (D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.11) is amended as follows: 39 |
---|
103 | 103 | | (1) A new subsection (c-1) is added to read as follows: 40 |
---|
104 | 104 | | “(c-1)(1) Notwithstanding any other provision in this chapter, no insurer shall deny 41 |
---|
105 | 105 | | coverage, cancel coverage, refuse to issue, determine the price or premium for, or otherwise vary 42 |
---|
106 | 106 | | any term or condition of a life insurance policy, disability insurance policy, or long-term care 43 |
---|
107 | 107 | | insurance policy for a person based solely, and without any actual, unique, and material actuarial 44 |
---|
108 | 108 | | risks, on the status of such person as a living organ donor.” 45 |
---|
109 | 109 | | “(2) This subsection applies to life insurance policies, disability insurance 46 |
---|
110 | 110 | | policies, or long-term care insurance policies delivered or issued for delivery after January 1, 47 |
---|
111 | 111 | | 2025.”. 48 |
---|
112 | 112 | | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 49 |
---|
113 | 113 | | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 50 |
---|
114 | 114 | | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 51 |
---|
115 | 115 | | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 52 |
---|
116 | 116 | | Sec. 4. Effective date. 53 |
---|
117 | 117 | | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 54 |
---|
118 | 118 | | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of Congressional review as 55 |
---|
119 | 119 | | provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 56 |
---|
120 | 120 | | 3 |
---|
121 | 121 | | |
---|
122 | 122 | | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Code § 1-206(c)(1)), and publication in the District of Columbia 57 |
---|
123 | 123 | | Register. 58 |
---|