Council | 08/02/2024 | Law L25-0194, Effective from Jul 19, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009567, Expires on Mar 01, 2025 | ||
Council | 06/07/2024 | Act A25-0482 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006752 | ||
Council | 06/05/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 05/30/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 05/29/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0482 | ||
Council | 05/21/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 3, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 04/01/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |