Council | 04/26/2024 | Act A25-0448 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004642, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/17/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/15/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0448, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/09/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 23, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 04/01/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |