Council | 11/26/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/26/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 11/12/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/12/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0794 | ||
Council | 07/12/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/21/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/14/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/26/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0794 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/23/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 04/22/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |