District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0794 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/22/2024

                     
 
 
 
 
Statement of Introduction – Evanti Court Designation Act of 2024 
April 18, 2024 
 
 Today, I am introducing the “Evanti Court Designation Act of 2024”, which would designate the 
public alley system in Square 2863, bounded by Euclid Street, Fairmont Street, Sherman Avenue, and 
11th Street Northwest, in Ward 1, as Evanti Court.  
 This alley designation is in honor of Lillian Evanti, a D.C. native and Howard University Graduate 
who lived in her family home at 1910 Vermont Ave, NW (approx. 6 blocks from the proposed alley 
designation) from 1904 until her death in 1967. Lillian Evanti was an incredibly talented and 
internationally celebrated opera singer and artist. Madame Evanti left an indelible imprint on cultural 
institutions in the District of Columbia: among other accomplishments, she was a founding member of the 
National Negro Opera Company and a chief advocate for a United States National Cultural Center, which 
would ultimately become the Kennedy Center.
1
 
 Improvement and redevelopment of alley lots is permitted in the District, but new housing built on 
an alley lot requires an official address – and thus, an official alley name. As I have done in the past, I 
welcome each opportunity to enable the construction of new housing, and to honor under-represented 
figures in D.C. history in doing so. 
 Over the course of four months, the team proposing to develop new homes in Square 2863 
presented to Advisory Neighborhood Commission 1B at two committee meetings and three full ANC 
meetings; flyers were distributed to neighbors and a separate community meeting was held to discuss 
options for names for the alley and answer questions about the proposed project.  
 Attached is a resolution in support of this alley designation, passed by ANC 1B on July 6, 2023. 
This resolution fulfills the requirement of D.C. Official Code § 9-204.21(j), making this designation worthy 
of Council consideration. 
 
  
 
 	Brianne K. Nadeau 
 	Councilmember, Ward 1 
 
1
 For more on the life of Lillian Evanti: https://anacostia.si.edu/collection/spotlight/madame-lillian-evanti.  
Aerial Image of Square 2863. Source: OCTO e-Sanborn Square 2863. Source: Office of Tax and Revenue   
 
 
 	1 
  _____________________________ 
  Councilmember Brianne K. Nadeau 
 
 
 
 
A BILL 
 
_________________________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________________ 
 
 
To designate the public alley system within Square 2863, bounded by Euclid Street, N.W., 1 
 Sherman Avenue, N.W., Fairmont Street, N.W., and 11
th
 Street, N.W., as Evanti Court.  2 
 3 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 4 
act may be cited as the “Evanti Court Designation Act of 2024”. 5 
 Sec. 2. Pursuant to sections 401, 403, and 421 of the Street and Alley Closing and 6 
Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 4-201; D.C. Official 7 
Code §§ 9-204.01, 9-204.03, and 9-204.21), the Council officially designates the entire portion 8 
of the public alley system within Square 2863, which is bounded by Euclid Street, N.W., 9 
Sherman Avenue, N.W., Fairmont Street, N.W., and 11
th
 Street, N.W., as “Evanti Court”. 10 
 Sec. 3. Transmittal. 11 
 The Council shall transmit a copy of this act, upon its effective date, to the Mayor, the 12 
District Department of Transportation, and the Office of the Surveyor. 13 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 14 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 15 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 16   
 
 
 	2 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 17 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 18 
 This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 19 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 20 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 21 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 22 
Columbia Register. 23   
ADVISORY NEIGHBORHOOD COMMISSION 1B 
 
Advisory Neighborhood Commission 1B serves the communities of lower Columbia Heights, LeDroit Park, 
Pleasant Plains, Shaw, U Street, Howard University, and lower Georgia Avenue. 
         
      A RESOLUTION IN SUPPORT OF  
NAMING THE ALLEY LOCATED AT 1021-1027 
EUCLID STREET NW IN MEMORY AND HONOR 
OF LILLIAN EVANTI  
 
 
WHEREAS; The alley (Square 2863) that runs east and west between 2600 blocks of 
11
th
 Street NW and Sherman Avenue NW and the 1000 blocks of Euclid Street NW 
and Fairmont Street NW, should be designated as “Evanti Court,” located in the 
Pleasant Plains neighborhood of Ward 1; 
 
WHEREAS; This alley designation would pay homage to the internationally 
acclaimed opera singer and composer Lillian Evanti. 
 
WHEREAS; The D.C. History Center described her as “an accomplished lyric 
soprano, a teacher, an international inspiration. She was a daughter, a mother, a friend. 
She endured the snubs and injustices of racial discrimination and the heartaches of a 
troubled marriage. But she never gave up. Washingtonians remember her today as a 
trailblazer whose contribution to the city’s cultural life is surpassed by few.” 
 
WHEREAS; Lillian Evanti was born and raised in Washington, D.C. Her family 
home is the Evans-Tibbs house in ANC 1B (1910 Vermont Ave NW by U Street), 
where she lived from 1904 until she died in 1967. Her notable accomplishments 
include graduating from Howard University School of Music in 1917, being the first 
African American to perform with a major European company, owned and founded 
the publishing company, Columbia Music Bureau in Washington, D.C., helped 
establish the National Negro Opera Company, served as a good-will ambassador in 
Latin America, and successfully lobbied for a national cultural center for performing 
arts, which became the Kennedy Center. 
 
WHEREAS; The DC Council will hold a public hearing at which the ANC will 
support and express enthusiasm about the naming of the alley in honor of Lillian 
Evanti; 
 
WHEREAS; The naming of the alley would support future development of a single-
family homes on a Lot 840 located in Square 2863. This property would be developed 
by a request for special exception relief from the alley width requirement to allow for a 
14 ft. 9 in. wide alley instead of a 15 ft. wide alley (Subtitle U § 601.1(f)); and 
 
WHEREAS; ANC 1B04 Commissioner and ABC 1B09 Commissioner have met with 
the owner of the lot to hear comments and concerns from neighbors abutting the 
property and that live on the block surrounding the lot. The community came to a 
consensus, expressing support and determining that the naming of the alley and 
development would have minimal to no adverse impact on the community. 
 
(continued on next page) 
2000 14 STREET, NW 
SUITE 100B  
WASHINGTON, DC 20009 
(202) 481-3462 
1b@anc.dc.gov 
@ANC1B 
 
 
 
COMMISSIONERS 
 
LARRY HANDERHAN 
VICE  CHAIR 
1b01@anc.dc.gov 
 
SEAN HOLIHAN 
1b02@anc.dc.gov 
 
JAMIE SYCAMORE 
1b03@anc.dc.gov 
 
SANTIAGO LAKATOS 
TREASURER 
1b04@anc.dc.gov 
 
ALAN KENSEK 
1b05@anc.dc.gov 
 
VACANT  
1b06@anc.dc.gov 
 
 
ASHLEIGH FIELDS 
1b07@anc.dc.gov 
 
SABEL HARRIS 
CHAIR 
1b08@anc.dc.gov 
 
 
TUCKER JONES 
SECRETARY 
1b09@anc.dc.gov 
 
 
   
ADVISORY NEIGHBORHOOD COMMISSION 1B 
 
Advisory Neighborhood Commission 1B serves the communities of lower Columbia Heights, LeDroit Park, 
Pleasant Plains, Shaw, U Street, Howard University, and lower Georgia Avenue. 
 
 
 
THEREFORE; BE IT RESOLVED THAT: ANC 1B support the naming of the alley located at 
1021-1027 Euclid Street NW and urges that DC Council to pass this measure. 
 
# # # # # 
Certification: 
After providing sufficient notice for and with a quorum of  of 8 present at its July 6, 2023, 
meeting, Advisory Neighborhood Commission 1B voted, with 6 Yeas, 0 Nos, and 0 
Abstentions, to adopt the above resolution.         
 
 
 
Sabel Harris Tucker Jones 
Chair, ANC 1B  Secretary, ANC 1B