District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0800 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/01/2024

                               
 
   
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
May 1, 2024 
  
Nyasha Smith, Secretary  
Council of the District of Columbia  
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW 
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Secretary Smith,  
 
Today, I am introducing the Mathematics Education Improvement Amendment Act of 2024. This 
legislation is co-introduced by Councilmembers Anita Bonds, Christian Henderson, Janeese Lewis 
George, Brianne Nadeau, Brooke Pinto, and Robert White	. Please find enclosed a signed copy of the 
legislation.  
 
As a former 7th grade mathematics teacher, I know firsthand how vital math is for the success of students 
and how far the District must go to improve student learning and achievement. School Year 2022-	2023 
PARCC scores show only 22% of DC students met or exceeded expectations for mathematics standards. 
There has been increased attention on improving literacy skills among District students—and while that is 
certainly worthwhile and an effort I support—there, too, needs to be heightened attention 	on improving 
math achievement. R	esearch has shown that math skills are highly correlated with later math 
achievement, reading achievement, and college attendance.
1
  
 
This legislation requires OSSE to establish a task force to research best practices and ways to 
systematically improve math achievement across Local Education Agencies.  The Task Force will submit 
its report of findings to the Mayor and Council by June 15, 2025. P	lease contact my Legislative Director, 
Kendra Wiley, at kwiley@dccouncil.gov if you have any questions about this legislation. 
 
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
Zachary Parker  
Ward 5 Councilmember  
 
1
 Jordan N., Kaplan D., Ramineni C., Locuniak M. 2009. Early math matters: Kindergarten number competence and later mathematics outcomes. 
Developmental Psychology, 45(3), 850–867; Duncan, Greg J., Chantelle J. Dowsett, Amy Claessens, Katherine Magnuson, Aletha C. Huston, 
Pamela Klebanov, Linda S. Pagani, Leon Feinstein, Mimi Engel, and Jeanne Brooks-Gunn. 2007. “School Readiness and Later Achievement.” 
Developmental Psychology 43, 6: 1428-1446; Duncan, Greg J., and Katherine Magnuson. 2009. “The Nature and Impact of Early Skills, 
Attention, and Behavior.” Paper presented at the Russell Sage Foundation Conference on Social Inequality and Educational Outcomes, New York 
City.   
 1 
__________________________________  ________________________________ 2 
Councilmember Janeese Lewis George  Councilmember Zachary Parker 3 
 4 
 5 
_______________________________ ________________________________ 6 
Councilmember Christina Henderson  Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 7 
 8 
 9 
 10 
_______________________________ ________________________________    11 
Councilmember Brianne K. Nadeau  Councilmember Brooke Pinto 12 
 13 
  14 
_______________________________ 15 
Councilmember Anita Bonds   16 
 17 
 18 
 19 
A BILL 20 
 21 
___________________ 22 
 23 
 24 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 25 
 26 
___________________ 27 
 28 
 29 
To establish a Mathematics Education Task Force and improve mathematics achievement in the 30 
District for students in grades kindergarten through grade 12. 31 
 32 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 33 
act may be cited as the “Mathematics Education Improvement Amendment Act of 2024”. 34 
Sec. 2. The State Education Office Establishment Act of 2000, effective October 21, 35 
2000 (D.C. Law 13-176; D.C. Official Code § 38-2601 et seq.), is amended by adding a new 36 
section as follows: 37 
Sec. 4115. Mathematics Literacy Education Task Force establishment. 38  2 
 
 “(a)(1) Starting no later than December 2, 2024, OSSE shall convene a Task Force of 39 
local and national experts, educators, and representatives in mathematics, which shall be known 40 
as the Mathematics Proficiency Task Force (“Task Force”). The Task Force shall include 41 
representatives from the following District government agencies:  42 
“(A) OSSE; 43 
“(B) DCPS; 44 
“(C) Public Charter School Board; 45 
“(D) State Board of Education; and  46 
“(E) Deputy Mayor for Education.  47 
           “(2) The Chairman of the Council shall appoint a Council representative to the 48 
Task Force. 49 
“(3) The Task Force shall meet every four weeks until it submits the report 50 
required pursuant to subsection (b) of this section.  51 
 “(b)(1) The Task Force shall submit a report to the Mayor and Council by June 15, 2025, 52 
identifying actionable steps to improve mathematics instruction and achievement in the District.  53 
 “(2) The report shall:  54 
“(A) Recommend evidence-informed, high-quality instructional 55 
mathematics teaching materials, curricula, and intervention programs for struggling students. 56 
“(i) For the purposes of this paragraph, “evidence-informed” 57 
means a researched mathematics program or practice, aligned with state standards, that is 58 
associated with improved student achievement outcomes. 59  3 
 
  “(B) Outline a process to create a state catalogue of educator professional 60 
development and resources focused on foundational mathematics content knowledge. 61 
“(C) Produce a list of vetted and approved “evidence-informed”  62 
curricula and assessments to identify and support students who are at below grade level or 63 
struggling in mathematics at the beginning of the year and monitor the effectiveness of 64 
interventions. 65 
“(D) Recommend intensive training programs for principals and instructional  66 
leaders in elementary, middle, and high schools to grow and accelerate student proficiencies in 67 
mathematics to help students below grade level or struggling in mathematics. The training 68 
programs must: 69 
 “(i) Include content aligned with student academic standards; 70 
“(ii) Address standards for mathematical practice; 71 
“(iii) Cultivate mathematical best practices; 72 
“(iv) Share best practices for providing instruction on interventions for 73 
students with disabilities and students who are English language learners; and 74 
 “(v) Be available to relevant school-based staff and staff at community-75 
based organizations. 76 
 77 
“(E) Outline a process to ensure there is a math coach trained in evidence-based  78 
practices at every school by School Year 2027-2028.  79 
“(F) Recommend systems for notifying the parents or guardians  80  4 
 
of students below grade level or struggling in mathematics, provide them with a list of 81 
interventions and acceleration strategies to assist with mathematics at home, including a list of 82 
curricula options, referrals for mathematics tutoring, or other intervention opportunities, when 83 
applicable. 84 
“(G) Make funding and programmatic recommendations to achieve steps outlined 85 
herein this subsection.” 86 
“(c) The Task Force shall not be considered a public body for purposes of the Open 87 
Meetings Act, effective March 31, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-350; D.C. Official Code § 2-571 et. 88 
Seq.).” 89 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.  90 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 91 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 92 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  93 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 94 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 95 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 96 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 97 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 98 
Columbia Register. 99