Council | 06/07/2024 | Act A25-0474 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006677, Expires on Aug 27, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/30/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 05/29/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0474, Expires on Aug 27, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/21/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 3, 2024 | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 05/06/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |