Council | 11/08/2024 | Act A25-0609 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 013494 | ||
Council | 11/01/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 10/30/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/28/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0609 | ||
Council | 10/16/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 30, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/15/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/15/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0811 | ||
Council | 09/18/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 09/18/2024 | Public Hearing | ||
Council | 08/16/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 08/12/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/10/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0811 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 05/06/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |