LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
B25-0834
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0834
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0834
Action History
Council
07/05/2024
Act A25-0491 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007593, Expires on Sep 30, 2024
Council
07/02/2024
Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0491, Expires on Sep 30, 2024
Council
06/17/2024
Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 2, 2024
Council
06/11/2024
Final Reading
Council
06/11/2024
Retained by the Council
Council
06/07/2024
Introduced in Office of the Secretary