District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0839 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 06/06/2024

                             
 
MURIEL BOWSER 
        MAYOR 
 
June 6, 2024 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
Enclosed for consideration and adoption by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed 
legislation entitled the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Emergency Declaration 
Resolution of 2024”, the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Emergency Act of 
2024”, the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Temporary Act of 2024”, and the 
“Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Act of 2024”. 
 
This legislation will officially designate the new park and recreation center at the site formerly 
known as the McMillan Sand Filtration site located at North Capitol Street and Michigan 
Avenue, NW, as the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center”. The 25-acre McMillan Sand Filtration 
site is being redeveloped into a new mixed-use development, and a core component of the 
redevelopment is the six-acre public park and recreation center with a pool, fitness center, open 
green spaces, and meeting and gallery space for public use that will be designated by this 
legislation. 
 
The name “Reservoir Park Recreation Center” was selected to speak to the site’s long association 
in the neighborhood with the adjacent water reservoir and the new name of the surrounding 
neighborhood, Reservoir Park.  On May 21, 2024, Advisory Neighborhood Commission 5E 
voted 5-1-0 in support of naming the new park “McMillan Park Recreation Center”.  However, 
naming this site “Reservoir Park Recreation Center” rather than continuing the association with 
the name McMillan is due to deliberative efforts to disassociate with the problematic history of 
the former Senator James McMillan, for whom the site was renamed named after it had been 
operating for several years.   
 
While the District has benefited from Senator McMillan’s efforts that led to the creation of the 
original water reservoir, today’s District cannot look past his troublesome record which harmed 
thousands of minorities in the United States and its territories and that spurred additional pain, 
economic loss, and racial inequities which we are still working to rectify today.  The “City  Beautiful” movement in the District, which he helped lead, also baked in segregation and 
demolished African-American communities without building alternative housing.  
We intend for the new park and recreation center to be open to the public in June.  Approval of 
the enclosed legislation will facilitate the installation of park signage before the park opens to the 
public.    
 
I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action on the enclosed legislation. 
 
Sincerely, 
 
 
Muriel Bowser 
 
Enclosure 
 
 
 
 
 
  ~ 	2{(p~ 
3 	at the request 	of the Mayor 
4 
5 
6 	A BILL 
7 
8 
9 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To officially designate, on an emergency basis, the park and recreation center located 
in Lot 105 
16 
in Square 3128 as "Reservoir Park Recreation Center". 
17 
18 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
19 act may be cited as the "Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Emergency Act 
of 2024". 
20 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 401 and 422 of the Street and Alley Closing and Acquisition 
21 Procedures Act of 1982, effective March l 0, 1983 (D.C. Law 4-201; D.C. Official Code 	§§ 9-
22 204.0 l and 9-204.22), the Council designates the park and recreation center located 	in Lot 105 in 
23 Square 3128 as "Reservoir Park Recreation Center". 
24 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
25 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement 	of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
26 impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act 	of 1975, 
27 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code §1-301.47a). 
28 Sec. 4 Effective date. 
29 This act shall take effect following approval 	by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
30 Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain 	in effect for no longer than 
31 90 days, as provided for emergency acts 	of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 32 
D.C. Official Code §1-	204.12(a)). 33