MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR June 6, 2024 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: Enclosed for consideration and adoption by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed legislation entitled the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”, the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Emergency Act of 2024”, the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Temporary Act of 2024”, and the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center Designation Act of 2024”. This legislation will officially designate the new park and recreation center at the site formerly known as the McMillan Sand Filtration site located at North Capitol Street and Michigan Avenue, NW, as the “Reservoir Park Recreation Center”. The 25-acre McMillan Sand Filtration site is being redeveloped into a new mixed-use development, and a core component of the redevelopment is the six-acre public park and recreation center with a pool, fitness center, open green spaces, and meeting and gallery space for public use that will be designated by this legislation. The name “Reservoir Park Recreation Center” was selected to speak to the site’s long association in the neighborhood with the adjacent water reservoir and the new name of the surrounding neighborhood, Reservoir Park. On May 21, 2024, Advisory Neighborhood Commission 5E voted 5-1-0 in support of naming the new park “McMillan Park Recreation Center”. However, naming this site “Reservoir Park Recreation Center” rather than continuing the association with the name McMillan is due to deliberative efforts to disassociate with the problematic history of the former Senator James McMillan, for whom the site was renamed named after it had been operating for several years. While the District has benefited from Senator McMillan’s efforts that led to the creation of the original water reservoir, today’s District cannot look past his troublesome record which harmed thousands of minorities in the United States and its territories and that spurred additional pain, economic loss, and racial inequities which we are still working to rectify today. The “City Beautiful” movement in the District, which he helped lead, also baked in segregation and demolished African-American communities without building alternative housing. We intend for the new park and recreation center to be open to the public in June. Approval of the enclosed legislation will facilitate the installation of park signage before the park opens to the public. I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action on the enclosed legislation. Sincerely, Muriel Bowser Enclosure 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 A BILL airman Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor 11 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 13 14 15 16 To designate, on a temporary basis, the park and recreation center located in Lot 105 in Square 17 3128 as "Reservoir Park Recreation Center". 18 19 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 act may be cited as the "Reservo ir Park Recreation Center D esignation Temporary Act of 2024". 21 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 401 and 422 of the Street and Alley Closing and Acquisition 22 Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 4-201; D. C. Official Code§§ 9- 23 204.01 and 9-204.22), the Council designates the park and recreation center located in Lot 105 in 24 Square 3128 as "Reservoir Park Recreation Center". 25 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 26 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the 27 impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 28 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code §1-301.47a). 29 Sec. 4 Effective date. 30 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 31 the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 32 as provided in section 602( c )( 1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code §1- 206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 33 Columbia Register. 34 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of having taken effect. 35