1 __________________________ 1 Councilmember Brooke Pinto 2 3 AN ACT 4 5 _________ 6 7 8 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 10 __________________ 11 12 13 To amend, on an emergency basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 14 Columbia Establishment Act of 2001 to require the Criminal Justice Coordinating 15 Council (“CJCC”) to transmit a report on risk factors for youth involvement in future gun 16 violence, to require that certain District agencies provide the CJCC with information 17 necessary to complete the report, and to authorize the Department of Health Care Finance 18 to disclose health and human services information to the CJCC for the purposes of 19 research on and analysis of criminal justice and public safety issues; to amend the Data-20 Sharing and Information Coordination Amendment Act of 2010 to allow the disclosure of 21 health and human services information to aid in the development of the report on risk 22 factors for youth involvement in future gun violence; and to amend the District of 23 Columbia Mental Health Information Act of 1978 to authorize the disclosure of mental 24 health information to aid in the development of the report on risk factors for youth 25 involvement in future gun violence. 26 27 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 28 act may be cited as the “Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing 29 Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 30 Sec. 2. Section 1505 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 31 Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 32 Code § 22–4234), is amended as follows: 33 (a) Subsection (a) is amended by adding a new paragraph (9) to read as follows: 34 2 “(9) Conduct research and analysis on matters affecting public safety and criminal 35 justice, including research and analysis utilizing behavioral health, physical health, employment, 36 and education data.”. 37 (b) A new subsection (a-1) is added to read as follows: 38 “(a-1) Agencies are authorized to provide personally identifying information to the 39 Criminal Justice Coordinating Council to aid in the development of reports pursuant to this 40 section.”. 41 (c) A new subsection (d) is added to read as follows: 42 “(d)(1) The CJCC shall conduct research and analysis, and develop reports, pertaining to 43 childhood factors that increase the likelihood of future involvement in gun violence for young 44 adults. 45 “(2) Upon request by the CJCC, and to aid in the development of reports produced 46 pursuant to this section, the Department of Health Care Finance (“DHCF”) shall provide, or cause 47 to be provided, the following information to the CJCC on adult individuals included in a given 48 study sample for the period of time when the individuals were under 18 years of age, including 49 any associated personal identifying information: 50 “(A) Demographic data, including: 51 “(i) Name, address, and date of birth; 52 “(ii) Sex; 53 “(iii) Gender; 54 “(iv) Race; and 55 “(v) Ethnicity; 56 “(B) Enrollment data, including; 57 3 “(i) Eligibility start date; 58 “(ii) Eligibility end date; and 59 “(iii) Eligibility basis; 60 “(C) Claims data with mental, behavioral, and neurodevelopmental disorder 61 diagnoses; and 62 “(D) Claims data with mental health procedures. 63 “(3) Where necessitated by District or federal law or regulations, DHCF may enter 64 into a Memorandum of Understanding with CJCC regarding the disclosure of data and other 65 information pursuant to this section.”. 66 Sec. 3. Section 102(a)(5) of the Data-Sharing and Information Coordination Amendment 67 Act of 2010, effective December 4, 2010 (D.C. Law 18-273; D.C. Official Code § 7-242(a)(5)), is 68 amended by striking the phrase “report required by section 1505(b-3) of the Criminal Justice 69 Coordinating Council for the District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 70 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official Code § 22–4234(b-3)” and inserting the phrase “reports 71 required by section 1505(b-3) and (d) of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District 72 of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 73 Code § 22–4234(b-3) and (d))” in its place. 74 Sec. 4. Section 302 of the District of Columbia Mental Health Information Act of 1978, 75 effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-136; D.C. Official Code § 7-1203.02), is amended by striking 76 the phrase “section 1505(b-3) of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 77 Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 78 Code § 22–4234(b-3)” and inserting the phrase “section 1505(b-3) and (d) of the Criminal Justice 79 4 Coordinating Council for the District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 80 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official Code § 22–4234(b-3) and (d))” in its place. 81 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 82 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 83 statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 84 October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 85 Sec. 6. Effective date. 86 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 87 Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 88 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 89 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 90 D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 91