District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0842 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/11/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
_________________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_____________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2001 to require the Criminal Justice Coordinating 
Council (“CJCC”) to transmit a report on risk factors for youth involvement in future gun 
violence, to require that certain District agencies provide the CJCC with information 
necessary to complete the report, and to authorize the Department of Health Care Finance 
to disclose health and human services information to the CJCC for the purposes of 
research on and analysis of criminal justice and public safety issues; to amend the Data-
Sharing and Information Coordination Amendment Act of 2010 to allow the disclosure of 
health and human services information to aid in the development of the report on risk 
factors for youth involvement in future gun violence; and to amend the District of 
Columbia Mental Health Information Act of 1978 to authorize the disclosure of mental 
health information to aid in the development of the report on risk factors for youth 
involvement in future gun violence. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Criminal Justice Coordinating Council Information Sharing 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 1505 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 
Code § 22–4234), is amended as follows: 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended by adding a new paragraph (9) to read as follows: 
“(9) Conduct research and analysis on matters affecting public safety and criminal 
justice, including research and analysis utilizing behavioral health, physical health, employment, 
and education data.”.  
(b) A new subsection (a-1) is added to read as follows: 
“(a-1) Agencies are authorized to provide personally identifying information to the 
Criminal Justice Coordinating Council to aid in the development of reports pursuant to this 
section.”. 
(c) A new subsection (d) is added to read as follows:    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 “(d)(1) The CJCC shall conduct research and analysis, and develop reports, pertaining to 
childhood factors that increase the likelihood of future involvement in gun violence for young 
adults.  
“(2) Upon request by the CJCC, and to aid in the development of reports produced 
pursuant to this section, the Department of Health Care Finance (“DHCF”) shall provide, or cause 
to be provided, the following information to the CJCC on adult individuals included in a given 
study sample for the period of time when the individuals were under 18 years of age, including 
any associated personal identifying information: 
 “(A) Demographic data, including: 
 “(i) Name, address, and date of birth; 
 “(ii) Sex; 
 “(iii) Gender; 
 “(iv) Race; and 
 “(v) Ethnicity; 
 “(B) Enrollment data, including; 
 “(i) Eligibility start date; 
 “(ii) Eligibility end date; and 
 “(iii) Eligibility basis;  
 “(C) Claims data with mental, behavioral, and neurodevelopmental disorder 
diagnoses; and 
 “(D) Claims data with mental health procedures.  
“(3) Where necessitated by District or federal law or regulations, DHCF may enter 
into a Memorandum of Understanding with CJCC regarding the disclosure of data and other 
information pursuant to this section.”. 
 
Sec. 3. Section 102(a)(5) of the Data-Sharing and Information Coordination Amendment 
Act of 2010, effective December 4, 2010 (D.C. Law 18-273; D.C. Official Code § 7-242(a)(5)), is 
amended by striking the phrase “report required by section 1505(b-3) of the Criminal Justice 
Coordinating Council for the District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 
3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official Code § 22–4234(b-3)” and inserting the phrase “reports 
required by section 1505(b-3) and (d) of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District 
of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 
Code § 22–4234(b-3) and (d))” in its place. 
 
Sec. 4. Section 302 of the District of Columbia Mental Health Information Act of 1978, 
effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-136; D.C. Official Code § 7-1203.02), is amended by striking 
the phrase “section 1505(b-3) of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 
Code § 22–4234(b-3)” and inserting the phrase “section 1505(b-3) and (d) of the Criminal Justice    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
Coordinating Council for the District of Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 
3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official Code § 22–4234(b-3) and (d))” in its place. 
 
Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 6. Effective date.  
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia