Council | 07/05/2024 | Act A25-0495 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 007606, Expires on Sep 24, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/27/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 06/26/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0495, Expires on Sep 24, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/17/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 2, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/10/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |