Council | 09/13/2024 | Law L25-0207, Effective from Sep 04, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 010778, Expires on Apr 17, 2025 | ||
Council | 09/04/2024 | Law Number L25-0207 Effective from Sep 04, 2024, Expires on Apr 17, 2025 | ||
Council | 07/26/2024 | Act A25-0510 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009330 | ||
Council | 07/23/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 07/18/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/18/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0510 | ||
Council | 07/08/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/14/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0846 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/10/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |