District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0857 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/24/2024

                    _______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
 4 
A BILL 5 
________ 6 
 7 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 
______________________ 9 
 10 
To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on 11 
voluntary agreements.  12 
 13 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 14 
be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”	. 15 
Sec. 2. T he Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6-	10; D.C. 16 
Official Code § 42-	3502.15a(a)), is amended by striking the phrase “for one year beginning on 17 
October 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “before January 1, 2025” in its place. 18 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 19 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 20 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 21 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 22 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 23 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 24 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 25 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 26 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 27 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 28