District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0857 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-AN ACT
7-
8-_______________
9-
10-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
11-
12-______________________
13-
14-To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on
15-voluntary agreements.
16-
17-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may
18-be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”.
19-
20-Sec. 2. Section 215a of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C.
21-Law 6-10; D.C. Official Code § 42-3502.15a(a)), is amended by striking the phrase “for one year
22-beginning on October 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “before January 1, 2025” in its place.
23-
24-Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.
25-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
26-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
27-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
28-
29-Sec. 4. Effective date.
30-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
31-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
32-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
33-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
34-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
35-
36-
37-______________________________
38-Chairman
39-Council of the District of Columbia
40-
41-
42-
43-_________________________________
44-Mayor
45-District of Columbia
1+_______________________________ 1
2+Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2
3+ 3
4+ 4
5+A BILL 5
6+________ 6
7+ 7
8+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8
9+______________________ 9
10+ 10
11+To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on 11
12+voluntary agreements. 12
13+ 13
14+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 14
15+be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024” . 15
16+Sec. 2. T he Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6- 10; D.C. 16
17+Official Code § 42- 3502.15a(a)), is amended by striking the phrase “for one year beginning on 17
18+October 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “before January 1, 2025” in its place. 18
19+Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 19
20+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 20
21+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 21
22+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 22
23+Sec. 4. Effective date. 23
24+This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 24
25+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 25
26+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 26
27+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 27
28+D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). 28