Council | 10/15/2024 | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 11, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/11/2024 | Act A25-0552 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 012135 | ||
Council | 10/08/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0552 | ||
Council | 09/26/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 09/23/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2024 | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 07/12/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0868 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Postponed to July 9, 2024 | ||
Council | 06/24/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/24/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |