District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0894 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/09/2024

                               	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
________________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_______________________ 
 
 
To authorize, on an emergency basis, the Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic 
Development to provide grant funding to a technology incubator in the District.  
  
  BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this  
act may be cited as the “Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development Technology 
Incubator Grant Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”.   
 
  Sec. 2. Section 2032 of the Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development 
Limited Grant-Making Authority Act of 2012, effective September 20, 2012 (D.C. Law 19-168; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-328.04), is amended by adding a new subsection (jj) to read as follows:  
 “(jj) Notwithstanding the Grant Administration Act of 2013, effective December 24, 2013 
(D.C. Law 20-61; D.C. Official Code § 1-328.11 et seq.):  
 “(1) In Fiscal Year 2024, the Deputy Mayor shall award a grant of $500,000 to 
Capital Factory for the purpose of supporting a technology incubator in the District; and  
 “(2) In Fiscal Year 2025, the Deputy Mayor shall award a grant of $1,500,000 to 
Capital Factory for the purpose of supporting a technology incubator in the District.”. 
   
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.  
  The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
  Sec. 4. Effective date.  
  This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer 
than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in  
 
     	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
  
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia