Council | 08/02/2024 | Act A25-0525 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009586, Expires on Oct 21, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/24/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/23/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0525, Expires on Oct 21, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/15/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 07/08/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |