Council | 10/15/2024 | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 11, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/11/2024 | Act A25-0565 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 012348 | ||
Council | 10/07/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/07/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0565 | ||
Council | 09/23/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2024 | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/12/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0905 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 07/08/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |