LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
B25-0930
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0930
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0930
Action History
Council
10/17/2024
Public Hearing Held
Council
10/11/2024
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Council
09/17/2024
Referred to Committee on Health
Council
07/26/2024
Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0930 Published in the DC Register
Council
07/12/2024
Introduced in Office of the Secretary