Council | 11/26/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/20/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 11/18/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 11/18/2024 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0952 | ||
Council | 11/07/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/18/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Referred to Committee on Facilities and Family Services | ||
Council | 09/27/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0952 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/16/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |