Council | 11/01/2024 | Act A25-0586 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 012962, Expires on Jan 22, 2025 | ||
Council | 10/24/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0586, Expires on Jan 22, 2025 | ||
Council | 10/21/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/08/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 23, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 09/30/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |