Council | 11/22/2024 | Act A25-0623 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 014105 | ||
Council | 11/13/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/13/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0623 | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 13, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/15/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/04/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0977 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 10/01/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 09/30/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |