District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1005 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/29/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the District Department of the Environment Establishment 
Act of 2005 to clarify that the Mayor may promulgate rules and regulations to implement 
the provisions of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 2005, 
and to eliminate the requirement that all rules and regulations be submitted to the Council 
for a 45-day active review period. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Rulemaking Clarification 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 110 of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act of 
2005, effective February 15, 2006 (D.C. Law 16-	51; D.C. Official Code § 8	-151.10) , is amended 
as follows: 
(a) Subsection ( a) is amended by striking the phrase “Mayor shall promulgate” and 
inserting the phrase “Mayor may promulgate ” in its place. 
(b) Subsection (b) is repealed.  
 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of July 29, 2021. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia