| 4 | + | Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | A BILL 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | To order, on an emergency basis, the closing of the 20-foot-wide public alley stub in Square 5051 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | in Northeast, in Ward 7; and to amend Section 47-4701 of the District of Columbia 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | Official Code to clarify when a tax abatement financial analysis must be provided for a 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | bill with a tax exemption or abatement that is not of general applicability. 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That, this 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | act may be cited as the “Closing of a Public Alley in Square 5051, S.O. 21-00136, Second 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | Emergency Act of 2024”. 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | Sec. 2. (a) Pursuant to section 404 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 787; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.04), and consistent with the Street 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | and Alley Closing and Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | 4-201; D.C. Official Code § 9-201.01 et seq.), the Council finds that the portion of public alley in 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | Square 5051, as shown on the Surveyor’s plat filed under S.O. 21-00136, is unnecessary for alley 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | purposes and orders it closed with title to the land to vest as shown on the Surveyor’s plat. 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | (b) The ordering of this alley closing is contingent upon satisfying the conditions set forth 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | by Washington Gas in the official file for S.O. 20-00136 prior to the recordation of the plat by 33 |
---|
| 36 | + | the Surveyor. 34 2 |
---|
8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | ___________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To order, on an emergency basis, the closing of two portions of the public alley system, including |
---|
18 | | - | a 20-foot-wide segment in Square 5051 in Northeast, in Ward 7; and to amend Section |
---|
19 | | - | 47-4701 of the District of Columbia Official Code to clarify when a tax abatement |
---|
20 | | - | financial analysis must be provided for a bill with a tax exemption or abatement that is |
---|
21 | | - | not of general applicability. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That, this |
---|
24 | | - | act may be cited as the “ Closing of a Public Alley in Square 5051, S.O. 21- 00136, Second |
---|
25 | | - | Emergency Act of 2024”. |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) Pursuant to section 404 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved |
---|
28 | | - | December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 787; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.04), and consistent with the Street |
---|
29 | | - | and Alley Closing and Acquisition Procedures Act of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. Law |
---|
30 | | - | 4-201; D.C. Official Code § 9- 201.01 et seq .), the Council finds that certain portions of the |
---|
31 | | - | public alley system in Square 5051, as shown on the Surveyor’s plat filed under S.O. 21- 00136, |
---|
32 | | - | are unnecessary for alley purposes and orders them closed with title to the land to vest as shown |
---|
33 | | - | on the Surveyor’s plat. |
---|
34 | | - | (b) The ordering of this alley closing is contingent upon satisfaction of the conditions set |
---|
35 | | - | forth by Washington Gas in the official file for S.O. 20- 00136 prior to the recordation of the plat |
---|
36 | | - | by the Surveyor. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 3. Section 47- 4701(a) of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended by |
---|
39 | | - | striking the phrase “shall not receive a Council hearing” and inserting the phrase “shall not be |
---|
40 | | - | considered on final reading by the Council ” in its place. |
---|
41 | | - | |
---|
42 | | - | Sec. 4. Applicability. |
---|
43 | | - | (a) Section 2 of this act shall apply as of October 24, 2024. |
---|
44 | | - | (b) Section 3 of this act shall apply as of November 14, 2024. |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
54 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
55 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
56 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). |
---|
57 | | - | |
---|
58 | | - | Sec. 6. Effective date. |
---|
59 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by |
---|
60 | | - | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer |
---|
61 | | - | than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in |
---|
62 | | - | section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 |
---|
63 | | - | Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). |
---|
64 | | - | |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Chairman |
---|
69 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | |
---|
72 | | - | |
---|
73 | | - | |
---|
74 | | - | |
---|
75 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
76 | | - | Mayor |
---|
77 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
78 | | - | |
---|
| 38 | + | Sec. 3. Section 47-4701(a) of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended by 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | striking the phrase “shall not receive a Council hearing” and inserting the phrase “shall not be 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | considered on final reading by the Council” in its place. 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | Sec. 4. Applicability date. 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | (a) Section 2 of this act shall apply as of October 24, 2024. 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | (b) Section 3 of this act shall apply as of November 14, 2024. 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 44 |
---|
| 48 | + | Sec. 6. Effective date. 45 |
---|
| 49 | + | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of a veto by 46 |
---|
| 50 | + | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer 47 |
---|
| 51 | + | than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 48 |
---|
| 52 | + | section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 49 |
---|
| 53 | + | Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 50 |
---|