LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
B25-1020
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1020
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1020
Action History
Council
11/25/2024
Returned from Mayor
Council
11/22/2024
Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0633, Expires on Feb 20, 2025
Council
11/19/2024
Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2024
Council
11/12/2024
Final Reading
Council
11/12/2024
Retained by the Council
Council
11/07/2024
Introduced in Office of the Secretary