District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1029 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/08/2024

                    1 
 
            _______________________________ 1 
                                 Councilmember Charles Allen 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_________ 8 
 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
__________________ 13 
 14 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 15 
to clarify the definition of “subscriber organization,” to amend the Lead-Hazard Prevention 16 
and Elimination Act of 2008 to clarify the definition of “lead-based paint,” and to amend 17 
the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014 to clarify the definition 18 
of “producer.” 19 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Definitions Clarification 21 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 22 
Sec. 2. Section 101(27A) of the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 23 
of 1999, effective May 9, 2000 (D.C. Law 13-107; D.C. Official Code § 34–1501(27A)), is 24 
amended by striking the phrase “Columbia law that owns” and inserting the phrase “Columbia 25 
law, or government entity, that owns” in its place.  26 
Sec. 3. Section 2(20) of the Lead-Hazard Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008, effective 27 
March 31, 2009 (D.C. Law 17-381; D.C. Official Code § 8–231.01(20), is amended by striking 28 
the phrase “(0.7 µg/cm²)” and inserting the phrase “(0.7 mg/cm²)” in its place.  29 
Sec. 4. Section 128(11)(A) of the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act 30 
of 2014, effective February 26, 2015 (D.C. Law 20-154; D.C. Official Code § 8–771.01(11)(A)), 31  2 
 
is amended by striking the phrase “who manufacturers a” and inserting the phrase “who 32 
manufactures a” in its place. 33 
Sec. 5. Applicability. 34 
(a) Section 2 shall apply as of December 13, 2013. 35 
(b) Section 3 shall apply as of March 16, 2021. 36 
(c) Section 4 shall apply as of March 16, 2021.  37 
Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. 38 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 39 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 40 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). 41 
Sec. 7. Effective date. 42 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 43 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 44 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 45 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 46 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 47