7 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
| 3 | + | _______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 4 | + | Councilmember Charles Allen 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | A BILL 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | _________ 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | __________________ 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | To amend, on an emergency basis, the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | to clarify the definition of “subscriber organization,” to amend the Lead-Hazard Prevention 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | and Elimination Act of 2008 to clarify the definition of “lead-based paint,” and to amend 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014 to clarify the definition 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | of “producer.” 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Definitions Clarification 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | Sec. 2. Section 101(27A) of the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | of 1999, effective May 9, 2000 (D.C. Law 13-107; D.C. Official Code § 34–1501(27A)), is 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | amended by striking the phrase “Columbia law that owns” and inserting the phrase “Columbia 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | law, or government entity, that owns” in its place. 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | Sec. 3. Section 2(20) of the Lead-Hazard Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008, effective 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | March 31, 2009 (D.C. Law 17-381; D.C. Official Code § 8–231.01(20), is amended by striking 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | the phrase “(0.7 µg/cm²)” and inserting the phrase “(0.7 mg/cm²)” in its place. 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | Sec. 4. Section 128(11)(A) of the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | of 2014, effective February 26, 2015 (D.C. Law 20-154; D.C. Official Code § 8–771.01(11)(A)), 31 2 |
---|
9 | | - | _________ |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | __________________ |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To amend, on an emergency basis, the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act |
---|
18 | | - | to clarify the definition of the term subscriber organization ; to amend the Lead -Hazard |
---|
19 | | - | Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008 to clarify the definition of the term lead -based |
---|
20 | | - | paint; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014 |
---|
21 | | - | to clarify the definition of the term producer. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
24 | | - | act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Definitions Clarification |
---|
25 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 101(27A) of the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act |
---|
28 | | - | of 1999, effective May 9, 2000 ( D.C. Law 13- 107; D.C. Official Code § 34 –1501(27A) ), is |
---|
29 | | - | amended by striking the phrase “Columbia law that owns” and inserting the phrase “Columbia |
---|
30 | | - | law, or government entity, that owns” in its place. |
---|
31 | | - | |
---|
32 | | - | Sec. 3. Section 2 (20) of the Lead -Hazard Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008, |
---|
33 | | - | effective March 31, 2009 (D.C. Law 17- 381; D.C. Official Code § 8–231.01(20 )), is amended by |
---|
34 | | - | striking the phrase “ (0.7 µg/cm²)” and inserting the phrase “(0.7 m g/cm²)” in its place. |
---|
35 | | - | |
---|
36 | | - | Sec. 4. Section 128(11)(A) of the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act |
---|
37 | | - | of 2014, effective March 16, 2021 ( D.C. Law 23- 211; D.C. Official Code § 8–771.01(11)(A) ), is |
---|
38 | | - | amended by striking the phrase “who manufacturers a” and inserting the phrase “who |
---|
39 | | - | manufactures a” in its place. |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | Sec. 5. Applicability. |
---|
42 | | - | (a) Section 2 shall apply as of December 13, 2013. |
---|
43 | | - | (b) Section 3 shall apply as of March 16, 2021. |
---|
44 | | - | (c) Section 4 shall apply as of Mar ch 16, 2021. |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | 2 |
---|
51 | | - | |
---|
52 | | - | Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
53 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
54 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
55 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). |
---|
56 | | - | |
---|
57 | | - | Sec. 7. Effective date. |
---|
58 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
59 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
60 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section |
---|
61 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
62 | | - | D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). |
---|
63 | | - | |
---|
64 | | - | |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Chairman |
---|
68 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | |
---|
72 | | - | |
---|
73 | | - | |
---|
74 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
75 | | - | Mayor |
---|
76 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
77 | | - | |
---|
| 35 | + | is amended by striking the phrase “who manufacturers a” and inserting the phrase “who 32 |
---|
| 36 | + | manufactures a” in its place. 33 |
---|
| 37 | + | Sec. 5. Applicability. 34 |
---|
| 38 | + | (a) Section 2 shall apply as of December 13, 2013. 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | (b) Section 3 shall apply as of March 16, 2021. 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | (c) Section 4 shall apply as of March 16, 2021. 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | Sec. 7. Effective date. 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 44 |
---|
| 48 | + | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 45 |
---|
| 49 | + | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 46 |
---|
| 50 | + | D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 47 |
---|